FL S0994 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that a person who is in his or her dwelling, residence, or vehicle does not have a duty to retreat, regardless of whether he or she is attacked, and has the right to stand his or her ground, etc.
Title
Use of Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
776 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
776 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/994 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0994/BillText/Filed/HTML |