FL S0994 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 4123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 4123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing provisions directing the Department of Environmental Protection to file specified reports with the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President of the Senate and to coordinate with the Florida Congressional Delegation on certain matters, etc.
Title
Federal Environmental Permitting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 4123 | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time -SJ 717 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-28 | Read 2nd time -SJ 697 | |
2012-02-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/12 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/27/12 | |
2012-01-31 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2012-01-24 | Favorable by- Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | |
2012-01-19 | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 01/24/12, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 82 | |
2011-12-06 | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation -SJ 82 | |
2011-11-16 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/994 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0994/BillText/Filed/HTML |