FL S0984 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Chapter No. 2015-28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Chapter No. 2015-28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "expenditure"; specifying that the term does not include use of a public facility or public property that is made available by a governmental entity to a legislator for a public purpose, to exempt such use from legislative lobbying requirements, etc.
Title
Exemption from Legislative Lobbying Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#387 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Chapter No. 2015-28 | |
2015-05-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-05-07 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed; YEAS 119 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-28 | House | Substituted for HB 599 |
2015-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-27 | House | Received |
2015-04-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/15 |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | In Messages |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/15 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/15/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/07/15, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/24/15, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0599 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 984 (Ch. 2015-28)