FL S0984 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows a local government code enforcement board to adopt requirements that are in lieu of residency standards for members of the board; provides criteria.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Government Code Enforcement Boards

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 75
2011-02-17 Referred to Community Affairs; Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism -SJ 75
2011-02-10 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16205Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback