FL S0982 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designating the "Care for Retired Law Enforcement Dogs Program Act"; requiring the Department of Law Enforcement to contract with a corporation not for profit to administer and manage the program; providing requirements for the disbursement of funds for the veterinary care of eligible retired law enforcement dogs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Care for Retired Law Enforcement Dogs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-02HouseIn Messages
2018-03-02SenatePassed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2018-03-02SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-01SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/18
2018-02-16SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-15SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2018-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/15/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-09SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/08/18, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-23SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-01-22SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/22/18, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-11-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H763 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
94369Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback