FL S0978 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Pending: Senate Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exemption from public records requirements for personal identifying information in applications submitted to the Department of State by persons seeking certification as victims of Florida reform school abuse; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Applications for Certification as a Victim of Florida Reform School Abuse

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2022-01-11SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2022-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/11/22, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2021-12-13SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2021-11-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S482 (Related) 2022-01-11 - Introduced
H161 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback