FL S0976 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that, in determining the assessed value of real property, the just value of the property attributable to a permanent standby generator may not be considered; exempting from ad valorem taxation the assessed value of permanent standby generators that are considered tangible personal property, etc.
Title
Ad Valorem Taxation of Generators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2017-11-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S974 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
193 | 626 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
196 | 186 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/976 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/976/BillText/Filed/HTML |