FL S0972 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the term "advanced or specialized nursing practice" to expand the scope of practice; authorizing an advanced practice registered nurse to perform certain functions and acts within his or her specialty without a protocol agreement or supervision if specified requirements are met; authorizing a qualified advanced practice registered nurse to admit, manage care for, and discharge certain patients and to provide an endorsement that is otherwise required to be provided by a physician, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Innovation in the Advanced Practice Registered Nursing Workforce

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-02-12SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H821 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3950191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4640125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4640155Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback