FL S0962 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Division of Vocational Rehabilitation to initiate, by a specified date, a performance improvement plan designed to achieve specified goals; requiring the division to submit a performance report annually, by a specified date, to the Governor and the Legislature which includes specified information, etc.
Title
Vocational Rehabilitation
Sponsors
Sen. Don Gaetz [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237) |
2016-02-18 | House | In Messages |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/02/16 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/27/16, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 01/21/16, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Favorable by Higher Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education, 01/11/16, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-12-11 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Fiscal Policy |
2015-11-30 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1359 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
H7029 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-237, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62)
H7029 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-237, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62)