FL S0956 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that K-12 public school students who meet certain requirements have a right to participate in extracurricular activities; authorizing public school students attending a public school that does not offer a particular extracurricular activity to participate in that extracurricular activity at another school, subject to certain requirements; deleting a criterion for students who are enrolled in non-Florida High School Athletic Association member private schools to participate in interscholastic or intrascholastic sports, etc.
Title
Extracurricular Activities
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Bean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Education |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0859 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/956 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0956/BillText/Filed/HTML |