FL S0950 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to the Florida State Employees' Charitable Campaign; prohibiting an organization, an entity, or a person from intentionally soliciting state employees for fundraising or business purposes within specified areas during specified times, etc.
Title
State Employment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 651 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Substituted HB 651 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled |
2018-01-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/31/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 01/24/18, 11:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/10/18, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2017-11-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H651 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-57
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 182 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/950 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/950/BillText/Filed/HTML |