FL S0938 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 6059
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Abrogating the scheduled repeal of provisions governing a direct-support organization that is permitted use of fixed properties and facilities of the state correctional system by the Department of Corrections, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Corrections' Direct-support Organization

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 6059
2018-03-06SenateSubstituted HB 6059
2018-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18
2018-02-16SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-15SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2018-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/15/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-09SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/08/18, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-23SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-01-22SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2018-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/22/18, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-11-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6059 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-143
S864 (Similar To) 2017-11-16 - Withdrawn prior to introduction

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
944802Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback