FL S0924 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Tampa Sulphur Springs Neighborhood of Promise Success Zone within the City of Tampa in Hillsborough County and the Overtown Children and Youth Coalition within the City of Miami in Miami-Dade County; providing for the projects to be managed by corporations not for profit that are not subject to control, supervision, or direction by any department of the state; providing that the success zone and the coalition are designed to encompass areas large enough to include certain components but small enough to allow programs and services to reach participants, etc.
Title
Children's Initiatives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Community Affairs; Rules |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2017-03-23 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/21/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0783 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee