FL S0922 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the Department of Education enter into a contract with an entity located outside the state to conduct a study and review of the Florida Education Finance Program and recommend any improvements that may be necessary. Requires that the department submit a report to the Legislature and the Governor by a specified date, etc. APPROPRIATION:
Title
Florida Education Finance Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-14 | Favorable by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 2 NAYS 1 -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-11 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 04/14/11, 9:15 am, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 71 | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Rules; Budget -SJ 72 | |
2011-02-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0729 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/922 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0922/BillText/Filed/HTML |