FL S0914 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a local government to use its publicly accessible website for legally required advertisements and public notices. Provides conditions for such use. Provides for advertisement on a publicly accessible website of a taxing authority's intent to adopt a millage rate and budget. Provides for advertisement of notice on such website of funding availability through a local housing assistance plan under the State Housing Initiatives Partnership Act, etc.
Title
Effective Public Notices by Governmental Entities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 71 | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 71 | |
2011-02-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0089 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
100 | 342 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
129 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
129 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
153 | 79 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
159 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
162 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3184 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
170 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
170 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
180 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
197 | 3632 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
200 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
255 | 0525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7049 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/914 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0914/BillText/Filed/HTML |