FL S0906 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that children in out-of-home care have a right to safe, stable, and nurturing relationships; providing requirements for a child in out-of-home care to maintain a relationship with his or her siblings and kith and kin; prohibiting communication and visits with siblings or kith and kin from being withheld as punishment; requiring the Department of Children and Families to give parents who are working toward reunification with their child certain resources to assist them in providing a safe, stable, and nurturing relationship, etc.
Title
Children in Out-of-home Care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 4095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/906 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0906/BillText/Filed/HTML |