FL S0902 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing a specified exemption from the tax imposed on rental or license fees charged for the use of commercial real property; authorizing the Department of Revenue to review any lease, license, or other information for certain purposes; providing for the future repeal of provisions relating to the imposition of a tax on the rental or license fees charged for the use of commercial real property, etc.
Title
Tax on Commercial Real Property
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H409 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ways and Means Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0598 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1258 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
338 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 840 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/902 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/902/BillText/Filed/HTML |