FL S0902 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring self-service stations to display on each pump a decal containing a telephone number to enable certain handicapped persons to seek assistance from the station attendant; requiring the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to provide decals and instructions; providing for enforcement by the department; establishing a deadline for compliance, etc.
Title
Sale of Liquid Fuels
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2013-03-05 | Senate | CS by Agriculture read 1st time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | Senate | CS by Agriculture; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/04/13, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0469 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee
H0503 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee
S0618 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Transportation
H0503 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee
S0618 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Transportation