FL S0900 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring hospitals to maintain a directory of unidentified persons containing specified information; requiring hospitals to make the directory available to the public upon request; requiring hospitals, before including an unidentified person in the directory, to inform the unidentified person of the directory and provide him or her with an opportunity to restrict or prohibit inclusion in the directory or disclosure of his or her personal identifying information, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unidentified Persons in Hospitals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2021-11-30SenateReferred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
2021-11-12SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1313 (Same As) 2022-01-14 - Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3951013Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback