FL S0900 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the Restaurant and Hotel Renovation Tax Refund Program; requiring the Department of Economic Opportunity to verify renovation project costs and the incremental sales tax revenue increases for approved applicants; requiring the Department of Revenue to remit tax refund payments upon certification, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-01SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-26SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2015-02-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0739 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee
H0101 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
212099Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback