FL S0900 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing formation of a public-private partnership between a state university or direct-support organization and a private entity; establishing procedures and requirements for the receipt, solicitation, and evaluation of proposals received by a state university board of trustees or direct-support organization; prohibiting a board of trustees or direct-support organization from proceeding with a comprehensive agreement under certain circumstances; providing for applicability of sovereign immunity to a comprehensive agreement, etc.
Title
Public-private Partnerships
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/09/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2014-04-01 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/25/14, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-17 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/11/14, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Education; Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0541 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations Committee
H0543 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Education Committee
S1396 (Related) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
H0543 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Education Committee
S1396 (Related) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar