FL S0900 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the issuance of a Combat Infantry Badge license plate. Provides qualifications and requirements for the plate. Provides for the use of proceeds from the sale of the plate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specialty License Plates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-04-29 In Messages
2011-04-28 Read 3rd time -SJ 555
2011-04-27 Read 2nd time -SJ 523
2011-04-25 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/11
2011-04-20 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 469
2011-04-14 Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -SJ 469
2011-04-11 On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/14/11, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2011-04-08 On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/13/11, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2011-04-05 CS by Transportation read 1st time -SJ 341
2011-03-31 Now in Budget -SJ 323
2011-03-30 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-03-29 CS by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 323
2011-03-24 On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/29/11, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 69
2011-02-17 Referred to Transportation; Budget -SJ 69
2011-02-09 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
320089Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback