FL S0892 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directing the Department of State to publish on its website a list of persons owing money to the state; requiring state agencies to forward such information to the department; requiring the department to also publish such information in state newspapers, etc.
Title
State Debtors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 75 | |
2011-12-06 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 75 | |
2011-11-09 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/892 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0892/BillText/Filed/HTML |