FL S0890 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 593
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 593
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain 911 public safety telecommunicators to receive ongoing telecommunicator cardiopulmonary resuscitation training; authorizing public safety agencies and certain other agencies to enter into reciprocal agreements to provide telecommunicator cardiopulmonary resuscitation under certain circumstances; providing requirements for certain employees who answer emergency medical service calls, etc.
Title
Telecommunicator Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 593 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Substituted HB 593 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/22 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 01/26/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/13/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H593 (Similar To) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-51