FL S0890 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for sworn state-certified law enforcement officers to serve as temporary 911 public safety telecommunicators. Provides training requirements.
Title
Public Safety Telecommunicators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#40 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-05-03 | In Messages | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time -SJ 746 | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on Consent Calendar, 05/03/11 | |
2011-04-29 | Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 605 | |
2011-04-26 | CS/CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time -SJ 479 | |
2011-04-14 | Now in Budget -SJ 470 | |
2011-04-13 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-04-12 | CS/CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 470 | |
2011-04-07 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/12/11, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-30 | Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 300 | |
2011-03-29 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-28 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 300 | |
2011-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/28/11, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 69 | |
2011-02-25 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/07/11, 3:15 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Community Affairs; Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 69 | |
2011-02-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0783 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration