FL S0888 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of State to develop instructions and procedures for the electronic submission of voted absentee ballots from overseas voters; requiring the department, in consultation with supervisors of elections, to develop security measures; prescribing requirements for such security measures; requiring the department to perform an annual security assessment, etc.
Title
Overseas Absentee Ballots
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0921 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/888 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0888/BillText/Filed/HTML |