FL S0886 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a municipality to charge customers receiving its utility services in another municipality the same rates, fees, and charges as it charges consumers within its municipal boundaries under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Municipal Water and Sewer Utility Rates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Regulated Industries; Rules |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H515 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/886 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/886/BillText/Filed/HTML |