FL S0884 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Chapter No. 2017-24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Chapter No. 2017-24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting persons from possessing separated shark fins except under certain conditions; providing penalties; prohibiting persons with suspended or revoked license privileges from engaging in certain activities, etc.
Title
Shark Fins
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Environmental Preservation and Conservation Committee | Sen. Travis Hutson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#267 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Chapter No. 2017-24 | |
2017-05-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-05-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2017-04-26 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-25 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 823 |
2017-04-20 | House | Received |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17 |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | In Messages |
2017-04-18 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-11 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/13/17 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/06/17, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources, 03/29/17, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources |
2017-03-15 | Senate | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/14/17, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0823 (Similar To) 2017-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 884 (Ch. 2017-24)