FL S0874 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting the State Housing Trust Fund and the Local Government Housing Trust Fund from a provision authorizing the Legislature, in the General Appropriations Act, to transfer unappropriated cash balances from specified trust funds to the Budget Stabilization Fund and General Revenue Fund, etc.
Title
State Funds
Sponsors
Sen. Kathleen Passidomo [R] | Sen. Linda Stewart [D] | Sen. Annette Taddeo [D] | Sen. Victor Torres [D] |
Sen. Bill Montford [D] | Sen. Debbie Mayfield [R] | Sen. Gary Farmer [D] | Sen. Perry Thurston [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/16/18, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/874 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/874/BillText/Filed/HTML |