FL S0872 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-15 - Chapter No. 2015-27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the court, if costs and attorney fees are to be paid from the estate under specified sections of law, to direct payment from a certain part of the estate or, under specified circumstances, to direct payment from a trust; requiring a personal representative to be removed and the letters of administration revoked if he or she was not qualified to act at the time of appointment; providing that a governing instrument may not direct that taxes be paid from property other than property passing under the governing instrument, except under specified conditions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Estates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#376 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-15 Chapter No. 2015-27
2015-05-14 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-28SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-28HouseCS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
2015-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-27HouseSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/HB 343
2015-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-24HouseReceived
2015-04-24HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/15
2015-04-24HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-23HouseIn Messages
2015-04-23SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2015-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-22SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-22SenateOrdered engrossed
2015-04-22SenateAmendment(s) adopted (388318, 733094, 738696)
2015-04-22SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-14SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2015-04-10SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/15
2015-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-09SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-04-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/09/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-04-02SenateCS/CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2015-04-02SenateNow in Rules
2015-04-02SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-31SenateCS/CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2015-03-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/31/15, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-17SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2015-03-12SenateNow in Banking and Insurance
2015-03-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-10SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2015-03-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/10/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-20SenateReferred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2015-02-12SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0343 (Similar To) 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 872 (Ch. 2015-27)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
733106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
733212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7332123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7333101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
733504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
733617Amended CodeSee Bill Text
733817Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7360708Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7361005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7361006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
738302Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/872
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0872/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0872/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0872/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0872/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0872/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0872/Amendment/475538/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0872/Amendment/846148/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0872/Amendment/388318/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0872/Amendment/733094/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0872/Amendment/738696/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0872/Vote/SenateVote_s0872e1016.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0872/Vote/HouseVote_s0872e1376.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback