FL S0872 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes certain governing bodies to apply to the Office of Tourism, Trade, and Economic Development to amend the boundary of an enterprise zone that includes a rural area of critical economic concern. Authorizes the office to approve the amendment application subject to certain requirements. Requires that the office establish the effective date of certain enterprise zones. Authorizes Martin County to apply to the Office of Tourism, Trade, and Economic Development for designation of an enterprise zone, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enterprise Zones

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 68
2011-02-17 Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 68
2011-02-08 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0725 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2900055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29000726Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback