FL S0868 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the authority of a governing body of a county to levy business taxes; deleting exceptions from certain apportionment and distribution requirements for certain counties; reducing the maximum fees for certain receipt transfers, etc.
Title
Local Business Taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1387 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 0535 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/868 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/868/BillText/Filed/HTML |