FL S0862 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 769 (Ch. 2016-135)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing forensic and civil facilities to order the continuation of psychotropic medications for clients receiving such medication in the jail before admission to those facilities under certain circumstances; requiring a jail physician to provide a current psychotropic medication order under certain circumstances; revising the time for dismissal of certain charges for defendants that remain incompetent to proceed to trial, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health Treatment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-08SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 769 (Ch. 2016-135)
2016-03-08SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 769
2016-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2016-03-04SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/16
2016-02-29SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2016-02-29SenateFavorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2016-02-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/29/16, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2016-02-11SenateCS/CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2016-02-11SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2016-02-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2016-02-10SenateCS/CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2016-02-09SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2016-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/10/16, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2016-02-03SenateNow in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2016-02-02SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2016-02-01SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2016-01-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/01/16, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced
2015-12-03SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Fiscal Policy
2015-11-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0769 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-135

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
394467Amended CodeSee Bill Text
916106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
916107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
91613Amended CodeSee Bill Text
916145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
91615Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback