FL S0862 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides legislative intent. Provides the duties of the Office of Minority Health. Requires the Office of Minority Health to submit an annual report to the Governor and Legislature. Requires consideration of minority health issues in state policy and planning. Requires the DOH, the AHCA, the DOEA, the DOC, and the DJJ to take minority health issues into consideration in their annual planning. Requires that boards or advisory boards of the DOH, the AHCA, or the DOEA seek equal representation of certain members, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Minority Health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 67
2011-02-17 Referred to Health Regulation; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Budget -SJ 67
2011-02-08 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38104016Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback