FL S0860 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 449 (Ch. 2019-147)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 449 (Ch. 2019-147)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing membership of the Alzheimer's Disease Advisory Committee; revising representation requirements of the committee; requiring the Department of Elderly Affairs to review and update the Alzheimer's disease state plan every 3 years in collaboration with certain parties; providing that certain clinics shall not receive decreased funding for a specified reason, etc.
Title
Alzheimer's Disease
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 449 (Ch. 2019-147) |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 449 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 03/20/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/11/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H449 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-147
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |