FL S0854 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-01-19 - In Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amending provisions to conform to the directive of the Legislature to the Division of Law Revision in s. 13, ch. 2021-269, Laws of Florida, to replace references to the Division of Pari-mutuel Wagering and references to the Department of Business and Professional Regulation relating to gaming with references to the Florida Gaming Control Commission to conform the Florida Statutes to the transfer of duties in s. 11, ch. 2021-269, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Statutes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-19HouseIn Messages
2022-01-19SenateImmediately certified
2022-01-19SenatePassed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
2022-01-19SenateRead 3rd time
2022-01-19SenateRead 2nd time
2022-01-13SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/19/22
2022-01-13SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2022-01-13SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2022-01-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/13/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2022-01-05SenateReferred to Rules
2022-01-04SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1671Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16713Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16715Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55001215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500555Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500951Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009514Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55024055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5502415Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5502614Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55026165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5502625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55026352Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5502704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550334Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503345Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503551Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550375Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550505Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5505251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550625Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5506305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5506308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55070Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550902Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5511045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551109Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551117Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551122Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81737Amended CodeSee Bill Text
849086Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback