FL S0852 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Florida Smart City Challenge Grant Program within the Department of Transportation; requiring a long-range transportation plan to consider infrastructure and technological improvements necessary to accommodate the increased use of autonomous technology and electric vehicles; amending provisions, beginning in a specified fiscal year, revising the annual allocations in the State Transportation Trust Fund for the Transportation Regional Incentive Program; prohibiting the department from programing certain projects to be funded in the 5-year work program after June 30, 2018, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Infrastructure

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied on Calendar
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-05SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-05SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-03-02SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 1
2018-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-02-22SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-21SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-02-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/21/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-23SenateCS by Transportation read 1st time
2018-01-22SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2018-01-19SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-18SenateCS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-01-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/18/18, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-29SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-11-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H633 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H535 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
H981 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S384 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S1200 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3160899Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33984Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34358Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback