FL S0852 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to the compassionate use of low-THC cannabis; creating the "Florida Medical Marijuana Act"; authorizing a registered patient or a designated caregiver to purchase, acquire, and possess up to the allowed amount of medical marijuana for a patient's medical use; requiring a registered patient or a designated caregiver to demonstrate certain actions in order to maintain the specified protections; requiring the department to notify law enforcement of the expired or cancelled identification card in certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Medical Marijuana
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Health Policy; Appropriations |
2015-11-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0063 (Similar To) 2015-12-15 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H4021 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S0616 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulated Industries
H0065 (Similar To) 2015-12-15 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H1183 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary Committee
H4021 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S0616 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulated Industries
H0065 (Similar To) 2015-12-15 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H1183 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 441 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 986 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 987 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 99 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 992 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 994 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 995 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 9951 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 996 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 997 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 998 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 999 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 9991 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
385 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/852 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0852/BillText/Filed/HTML |