FL S0850 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a court to conduct a trial within a specified timeframe for certain actions involving possession of a dwelling unit; deleting a requirement that a tenant who wishes to defend against certain actions by a landlord comply with a specified provision, etc.
Title
Actions for Rent or Possession
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules |
2017-11-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1007 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
83 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
83 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/850 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/850/BillText/Filed/HTML |