FL S0850 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 549 (Ch. 2016-84)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 549 (Ch. 2016-84)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying the earliest date that incidents constituting a pattern of racketeering activity may have occurred; authorizing an investigative agency to institute a civil proceeding for forfeiture in a circuit court in certain circumstances; authorizing a court to order the forfeiture of other property of the defendant up to the value of unavailable property in certain circumstances; deleting the definition of "investigative agency" for purposes of provisions relating to civil investigative subpoenas, etc.
Title
Offenses Concerning Racketeering and Illegal Debts
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Bradley [R] | Sen. Greg Evers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 549 (Ch. 2016-84) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Substituted HB 549 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/16 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/25/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/17/16, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/11/16, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/01/16, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2015-11-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0549 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-84
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
895 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
895 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
895 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
895 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
905 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
92 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |