FL S0848 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising provisions related to the suspension of civil rights to apply to persons convicted of certain felonies, etc.
Title
Suspension of Civil Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/17/17, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0177 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H0189 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H0189 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Withdrawn prior to introduction