FL S0840 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the tax collector, upon petition, to appoint an agent in charge of a general lines agency as an agent for the tax collector to carry out certain duties; requiring all general lines agencies appointed as agents for the tax collector to fulfill certain requirements; authorizing agents of general lines to have discretion in whether to provide certain services; limiting the locations where agents of general lines may provide services, etc.
Title
Appointment of a General Lines Agency as an Agent for a Tax Collector
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Now in Banking and Insurance |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/30/24, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H817 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
S736 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Chapter No. 2024-272
S736 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Chapter No. 2024-272