FL S0840 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring cancer clinical trial programs to inform prospective patient subjects of specified reimbursements for ancillary and travel expenses which may be available to them and their caregivers if they participate in a cancer clinical trial; authorizing corporations, individuals, public and private foundations, health care providers, and other stakeholders to offer financial assistance to support approved reimbursements of ancillary and travel expenses for patient subjects in a cancer clinical trial and their caregivers, etc.
Title
Cancer Clinical Trials
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2019-11-08 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/840 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/840/BillText/Filed/HTML |