FL S0834 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a defendant to move a sentencing court to depart from the mandatory minimum term of imprisonment of 3 years and from the mandatory fine for a drug trafficking violation involving a certain quantity of a specified controlled substance; authorizing the sentencing court to grant the motion if the court finds that the defendant has demonstrated by a preponderance of the evidence that specified criteria are met, etc.
Title
Controlled Substances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/834 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0834/BillText/Filed/HTML |