FL S0834 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the term "full-time student" to delete references to membership in a double-session school or a school that uses a specified experimental calendar; clarifying how "full time equivalency" is calculated for students in schools that operate for less than the minimum term, etc.
Title
Minimum Term School Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237) |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/18/16, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 02/11/16, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Favorable by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 01/27/16, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2015-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7029 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-237, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62)
S1136 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
S0830 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
S1166 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
S1136 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
S0830 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
S1166 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/834 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0834/BillText/Filed/HTML |