FL S0826 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Chapter No. 2016-169
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Chapter No. 2016-169
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising certain notice requirements for written complaints; requiring the Division of Florida Condominiums, Timeshares, and Mobile Homes to adopt rules to implement board member training requirements; authorizing a mobile home park owner to pass on non-ad valorem assessments to a tenant under certain circumstances; authorizing a mobile home purchaser to cancel or rescind the contract to purchase under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Mobile Homes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#798 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Chapter No. 2016-169 | |
2016-04-01 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-08 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-07 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-07 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 743 |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-04 | House | Received |
2016-03-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/16 |
2016-03-04 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2016-02-24 | House | In Messages |
2016-02-23 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/18/16 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/10/16, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2016-01-27 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/26/16, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/13/16, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy |
2015-11-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0743 (Same As) 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 826 (Ch. 2016-169)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
723 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 078 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 0781 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |