FL S0826 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that after a specified time, a title insurer must pay the claim or pay an additional percentage above the initial amount insured to reimburse the policyholder for certain expenses until the claim is cured; providing conditions and amounts for the simultaneous issue of an owner's title insurance policy in additional to the loan title insurance policy; providing criteria for the supplemental coverage; establishing the premium for such coverage and providing for a waiver of coverage; specifying that a title insurer's determination of insurability must be based on the evaluation of a reasonable title search beginning with a root of title, etc.
Title
Title Insurance Claims
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Judiciary | |
2012-02-07 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/09/12, 1:15 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered | |
2012-02-07 | Now in Judiciary -SJ 301 | |
2012-01-31 | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time -SJ 305 | |
2012-01-30 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-26 | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 301 | |
2012-01-23 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/26/12, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-13 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/19/12, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 69 | |
2011-12-05 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 69 | |
2011-11-03 | Filed |