FL S0822 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that persons who manage bail bond agencies are subject to certain requirements; providing for licensure, rather than temporary licensure, of limited surety agents and professional bail bond agents; specifying requirements for applications for designation as a primary bail bond agent; revising the entities from whom a bail bond agent must receive licensure and appointment before registering as a bail bond agent, etc.
Title
Bail Bond Agents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1141 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
648 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 285 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 355 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 382 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 386 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 3875 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 441 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
843 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/822 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/822/BillText/Filed/HTML |