FL S0822 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing preconditions for the amendment of a prospectus or offering circular; providing additional disclosure requirements before the rental of a mobile home lot; requiring the Division of Florida Condominiums, Timeshares, and Mobile Homes to create a mobile home disclosure document for certain purposes; providing additional required prospectus or offering circular information relating to change of land use; providing notice requirements for a reduction in services, utilities, or amenities by a park owner; providing what constitutes the market area or the competitive area for comparable mobile home parks; increasing fees for mobile home park owner applications for payment of moving expenses; revising the payment amounts mobile home owners are entitled from the Florida Mobile Home Relocation Corporation under certain conditions involving a change in land use, etc.
Title
Mobile Home Parks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Regulated Industries | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 69 | |
2011-12-05 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 69 | |
2011-11-03 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
553 | 382 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 06116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 0612 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/822 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0822/BillText/Filed/HTML |