FL S0818 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Reducing the percentage of the sales price of certain mobile homes which is subject to sales tax; exempting certain recreational vehicle dealer applicants from a garage liability insurance requirement; revising an exemption for certain water service resellers from regulation by the Florida Public Service Commission relating to water and wastewater systems; specifying a requirement for disclosing and agreeing to a mobile home lot rental increase; providing that a mobile home park damaged or destroyed due to natural forces may be rebuilt with the same density as previously approved, permitted, or built, etc.
Title
Manufactured Housing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Finance and Tax |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2020-01-14 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 01/13/20, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S998 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1339
H1339 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-27
H1339 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-27
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 77 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 771 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 822 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 8232 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
367 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |